NJ A4118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits individuals to submit TDI and family temporary disability leave claims to DOLWD prior to commencement of leave under certain circumstances and requires timely payment of benefits for such claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits individuals to submit TDI and family temporary disability leave claims to DOLWD prior to commencement of leave under certain circumstances and requires timely payment of benefits for such claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.128.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S1838
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-1-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-06-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1838 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4118

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback