NJ A4110 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S419

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain school buses to be equipped with lap and shoulder seat belts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain school buses to be equipped with lap and shoulder seat belts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S233 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S233
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-4)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S233 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4110 (1R)
S419 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback