NJ A4103 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2268
Note: Carry Foward to future S3120
Note: Carry Over of previous S1642
Note: Carry Over of previous A2713

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits emergency homeless shelters from conditioning provision of shelter on enrollment in certain programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits emergency homeless shelters from conditioning provision of shelter on enrollment in certain programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
2022-06-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4103 (Carry Over) 2023-06-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4103 (Carry Over) 2023-06-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S2332 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1642 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2713 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback