NJ A4103 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2720 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2720 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires autocycles to be insured by PIP coverage to pedestrians.
Title
Requires autocycles to be insured by PIP coverage to pedestrians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2720 (1R) |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2720 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.110.