NJ A4088 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "High School to College Readiness Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to enhance student preparation for postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "High School to College Readiness Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to enhance student preparation for postsecondary education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2567 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.170.
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2567
2017-06-19SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2017-06-12SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2016-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2567 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4088 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback