NJ A4085 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Title
Establishes "Succeed in New Jersey" student loan reimbursement program for certain New Jersey residents employed in designated fields.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (60-12-4) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2559 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee