NJ A4084 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to establish income-driven repayment option and loan rehabilitation program for borrowers under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.
Title
Requires Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to establish income-driven repayment option and loan rehabilitation program for borrowers under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4084 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2576 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2573 (Same As) 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2576 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2573 (Same As) 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading