NJ A4081 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.
Title
Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S2665 |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2665 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.8.