NJ A4079 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1857
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides civil immunity to persons who forcibly enter motor vehicles to remove unattended and unsupervised children.
Title
Provides civil immunity to persons who forcibly enter motor vehicles to remove unattended and unsupervised children.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4079 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)