NJ A4076 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by S847

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S847 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to provide daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5; permits denial of recess for violation of code of student conduct but student must be provided restorative justice activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblySubstituted by S847 (3R)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S847 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.73.
S847 (Replaced by) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.73.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback