NJ A4073 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2766 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.52.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2018-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S2766 (1R)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-06-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2766 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4073 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback