NJ A4056 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1363
Note: Carry Foward to future A3650
Note: Carry Over of previous S1310
Note: Carry Over of previous A4166

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages wearing blue to honor law enforcement officers on Peace Officers Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encourages wearing blue to honor law enforcement officers on Peace Officers Memorial Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4056 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4056 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1435 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1310 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4166 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback