NJ A4016 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes six-month driver license suspension optional penalty for casino gambling by person under legal age of 21.
Title
Makes six-month driver license suspension optional penalty for casino gambling by person under legal age of 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4016 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach)
S3307 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach)
S3307 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Beach)