NJ A4013 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2483
Note: Carry Foward to future S1897
Note: Carry Foward to future S1897
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain group homes to install electronic monitoring devices in common areas, upon request and with uniform resident consent, and to permit consensual use of such devices in private rooms.
Title
Requires certain group homes to install electronic monitoring devices in common areas, upon request and with uniform resident consent, and to permit consensual use of such devices in private rooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4013 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4013 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3301 (Same As) 2020-12-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4013 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3301 (Same As) 2020-12-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee