NJ A4011 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S601 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S601 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Solar Panel Recycling Commission."*
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Solar Panel Recycling Commission."*
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S601 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S601 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.215.
S3465 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S3465 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee