NJ A3993 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2690/2727 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2690/2727 (SCS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers and carriers from engaging in "clawback" and "gag clause" practices; requires certain disclosures by pharmacists; requires Director of Division of Consumer Affairs to conduct public information campaign.***
Title
Prohibits pharmacy benefits managers and carriers from engaging in "clawback" and "gag clause" practices; requires certain disclosures by pharmacists; requires Director of Division of Consumer Affairs to conduct public information campaign.***
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2690/2727 (SCS/2R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2690 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.257.