NJ A3948 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires money transmitters to provide training materials to delegates concerning financial abuse and exploitation of elder adults.
Title
Requires money transmitters to provide training materials to delegates concerning financial abuse and exploitation of elder adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2762 (Same As) 2015-02-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee