NJ A3946 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides relief to students receiving State financial aid to address special circumstances due to 2020 health state of emergency.
Title
Provides relief to students receiving State financial aid to address special circumstances due to 2020 health state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S2356 |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Same As) 2020-05-15 - Approved P.L.2020, c.31.