NJ A3946 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.148.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c.148.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain qualifications for employment as a surgical technologist.
Title
Requires certain qualifications for employment as a surgical technologist.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Barbara Buono [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Joan Voss [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-20 | Approved P.L.2011, c.148. | |
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) | |
2011-12-01 | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. | |
2011-12-01 | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only | |
2011-11-10 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for S2817 (2R) | |
2011-06-27 | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Buono) | |
2011-06-23 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-23 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2817 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A3946 (2R)