NJ A3929 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Approved P.L.2022, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Approved P.L.2022, c.72.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Title
Allows certain voters residing overseas to vote in certain elections in this State depending on overseas residency or intent to return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2899 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2899 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.72. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-30-1) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-15) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2899 (1R) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-30-1) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2899 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3929 (2R)