NJ A3915 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pay for costs to conduct new election if the State is at fault for errors during initial election that requires new election to be held.
Title
Requires State to pay for costs to conduct new election if the State is at fault for errors during initial election that requires new election to be held.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Kim Eulner [R] | Rep. Marilyn Piperno [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2527 (Same As) 2022-06-23 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading