NJ A3904 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.
Title
"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S862 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.113. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S862 (1R) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S862 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3904