NJ A3904 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Tommy's Law"; requires NJT to take certain action and adopt policies concerning person injured or killed in incidents involving NJT motorbuses and rail or light rail vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S862 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.113.
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S862 (1R)
2018-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S862 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3904

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback