NJ A3904 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes operation of lottery courier services.
Title
Authorizes operation of lottery courier services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S2370 |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2370 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.11.