NJ A3901 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2364 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2364 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local unit approval of applications for participation in federal 1033 program.
Title
Requires local unit approval of applications for participation in federal 1033 program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2364 (1R) |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Approved P.L.2015, c.23.