NJ A3899 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1619
Note: Carry Over of previous A3113
Note: Carry Over of previous A3113
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-01-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates pilot program to provide corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for value of certain fruit and vegetable donations made by commercial farm operators.
Title
Creates pilot program to provide corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for value of certain fruit and vegetable donations made by commercial farm operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-24 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-10-24 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-10-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2200 (Same As) 2025-03-24 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1619 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3113 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1619 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3113 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee