NJ A3899 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2422 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2422 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates "New Jersey Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act" to current standards of National Association of Insurance Commissioners.
Title
Updates "New Jersey Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act" to current standards of National Association of Insurance Commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2422 (1R) |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2422 (Same As) 2022-08-12 - Approved P.L.2022, c.98.