NJ A3891 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Innovation and Research Fellowship Program in DOWLD.
Title
Establishes NJ Innovation and Research Fellowship Program in DOWLD.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Maria Rodriguez-Gregg [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Caroline Casagrande [R] |
Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S2442 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2442 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.235.