NJ A3888 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.101.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows issuance of additional alcoholic beverage licenses within boundaries of formerly federally owned or operated military installations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows issuance of additional alcoholic beverage licenses within boundaries of formerly federally owned or operated military installations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2498 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.101.
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-2-2)
2018-06-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (35-2)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S2498 (1R)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (23-6) (Gopal)
2018-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (64-3-2)
2018-06-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-05-17AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2498 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3888 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback