NJ A3871 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.112.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns disqualification from unemployment benefits for misconduct.
Title
Concerns disqualification from unemployment benefits for misconduct.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2439 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.112. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-15) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2439 (1R) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-25-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3871 (1R)