NJ A3864 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2846
Note: Carry Foward to future S1457
Note: Carry Over of previous S2442
Note: Carry Foward to future S1457
Note: Carry Over of previous S2442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain local units and authorities, to reduce water, and sewer, and stormwater fees and other charges for low-income persons.**
Title
Permits certain local units and authorities, to reduce water, and sewer, and stormwater fees and other charges for low-income persons.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3864 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3864 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S276 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2442 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3864 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S276 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2442 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee