NJ A3843 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.142.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits municipality to enact ordinance allowing voluntary registration of private outdoor video surveillance cameras.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits municipality to enact ordinance allowing voluntary registration of private outdoor video surveillance cameras.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2735 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2735 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-09SenateApproved P.L.2015, c.142.
2015-07-16SenatePassed Both Houses (Bill delivered to Governor)
2015-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-3)
2015-06-29SenateSubstituted for S2735 (2R)
2015-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Rice) Sa reverts to 1R
2015-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-02-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2015-01-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (58-13-0)
2015-01-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-10-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2735 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A3843 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback