NJ A3810 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by S2401
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2401 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2401 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for EDA small business loan program to specifically include certain farming operations and qualified dairy farmers. *
Title
Expands eligibility for EDA small business loan program to specifically include certain farming operations and qualified dairy farmers. *
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2401 (ACS) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2401 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
S2401 (Replaced by) 2019-05-23 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
S2401 (Replaced by) 2019-05-23 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1)