NJ A3803 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S525
Note: Carry Foward to future A280
Note: Carry Over of previous S3069
Note: Carry Over of previous A4654
Note: Carry Foward to future A280
Note: Carry Over of previous S3069
Note: Carry Over of previous A4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances, and allocates funds for, pre-apprenticeship programs.
Title
Enhances, and allocates funds for, pre-apprenticeship programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3803 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3803 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S688 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S3069 (Carry Over) 2019-09-12 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz)
A4654 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3803 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S688 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S3069 (Carry Over) 2019-09-12 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz)
A4654 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3803 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3803_I1.HTM |