NJ A3791 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2454 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2454 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Streamlines responsibilities of Division of Local Government Services and local governments; designated as the Division of Local Government Services Modernization and Local Mandate Relief Act of 2015.
Title
Streamlines responsibilities of Division of Local Government Services and local governments; designated as the Division of Local Government Services Modernization and Local Mandate Relief Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Stender [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. Robert Clifton [R] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S2454 (3R) |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2454 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.95.