NJ A3767 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5013
Note: Carry Foward to future S2062
Note: Carry Foward to future S2062
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of State to develop national marketing campaign promoting State's innovation economy.
Title
Directs Secretary of State to develop national marketing campaign promoting State's innovation economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-0) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3767 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3767 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3194 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3767 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3194 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading