NJ A3765 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits school district superintendent to designate school employee with certain expertise as school safety specialist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits school district superintendent to designate school employee with certain expertise as school safety specialist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2456 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.100.
2018-07-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S2456
2018-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2456 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3765

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback