NJ A3756 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2472 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2472 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain real estate licensees to complete courses of study concerning fair housing and housing discrimination.
Title
Requires certain real estate licensees to complete courses of study concerning fair housing and housing discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2472 (1R) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2472 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.177.