NJ A3748 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires background check for private gun sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires background check for private gun sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2013-02-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (45-29-0)
2013-02-14AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (O'Donnell)
2013-02-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback