NJ A3742 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1821

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires 9-1-1 service facilities be equipped with Next Generation 9-1-1 system and provides funding for that purpose; makes texting the 9-1-1 emergency system without purpose of reporting need for 9-1-1 service a fourth degree crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires 9-1-1 service facilities be equipped with Next Generation 9-1-1 system and provides funding for that purpose; makes texting the 9-1-1 emergency system without purpose of reporting need for 9-1-1 service a fourth degree crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15AssemblyWithdrawn from Consideration
2018-04-05AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1821 (Carry Over) 2016-05-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback