NJ A3732 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A2522

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-03-24 - Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes third degree crime for certain trespasses involving victim of domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes third degree crime for certain trespasses involving victim of domestic violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-03-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2025-03-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2025-03-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2024-02-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2522 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3352 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback