NJ A3726 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S771

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-26-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires large food waste generators to separate and recycle food waste and amends definition of "Class I renewable energy."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires large food waste generators to separate and recycle food waste and amends definition of "Class I renewable energy."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4039 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-26-3)
2019-06-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-27SenatePassed by the Senate (24-9)
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted for S4039
2019-06-27SenateSenate Amendment (21-6) (Smith)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-18-3)
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-22-3)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-26AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1206 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Senate Amendment (26-3) (Smith)
S771 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Senate Amendment (28-0) (Smith)
S4039 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A3726 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback