NJ A3713 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S936
Note: Carry Over of previous S1070
Note: Carry Over of previous A4929
Note: Carry Over of previous S1070
Note: Carry Over of previous A4929
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"College Mental Health Services Act"; establishes grant program for public institutions of higher education and requires public institutions of higher education to report certain information concerning mental health treatment and suicides.
Title
"College Mental Health Services Act"; establishes grant program for public institutions of higher education and requires public institutions of higher education to report certain information concerning mental health treatment and suicides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-4) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3713 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2195 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1070 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4929 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2195 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1070 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4929 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee