NJ A3711 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2626
Note: Carry Over of previous A3138
Note: Carry Over of previous S2552
Note: Carry Over of previous A3138
Note: Carry Over of previous S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to farmers who develop qualified native pollinator habitat on farms.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to farmers who develop qualified native pollinator habitat on farms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3711 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S80 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3138 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2552 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S80 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3138 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S2552 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3711 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3711_I1.HTM |