NJ A3708 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3368
Note: Carry Over of previous A4532
Note: Carry Over of previous A4532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance carriers to provide notice of termination of coverage to covered persons in certain circumstances.
Title
Requires health insurance carriers to provide notice of termination of coverage to covered persons in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-1) |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3708 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4532 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4532 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading