NJ A3707 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Approved P.L.2022, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-20 - Approved P.L.2022, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to New Jersey Task Force on Child Abuse and Neglect; establishes child protection worker caseload standards.
Title
Makes various changes to New Jersey Task Force on Child Abuse and Neglect; establishes child protection worker caseload standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2395 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2395 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.130. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2395 (2R) |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-10-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2395 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Substituted by A3707 (1R)