NJ A3702 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes public awareness campaign advising pregnant women, new parents, and women who are breast feeding about dangers of casual milk sharing.
Title
Establishes public awareness campaign advising pregnant women, new parents, and women who are breast feeding about dangers of casual milk sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3129 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee