NJ A3691 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S543
Note: Carry Foward to future A3120
Note: Carry Foward to future S156
Note: Carry Over of previous A4922
Note: Carry Over of previous S3280
Note: Carry Foward to future A3120
Note: Carry Foward to future S156
Note: Carry Over of previous A4922
Note: Carry Over of previous S3280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Division of Women's Services in DOC.
Title
Establishes Division of Women's Services in DOC.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3691 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3691 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3691 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4922 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3098 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3280 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3691 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3691 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4922 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3098 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3280 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3691 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3691_I1.HTM |