NJ A3687 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5413
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.358.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.358.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain family or household members and victims be notified when firearms are returned to persons charged with domestic violence or subject to extreme risk protection order.
Title
Requires certain family or household members and victims be notified when firearms are returned to persons charged with domestic violence or subject to extreme risk protection order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.358. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-5) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3105 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-4-2) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5413 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3105 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A3687 (1R)
S3105 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A3687 (1R)