NJ A3687 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Disqualifies person named on federal Terrorist Watchlist from obtaining firearms identification card or permit to purchase handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disqualifies person named on federal Terrorist Watchlist from obtaining firearms identification card or permit to purchase handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2485 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-08SenateApproved P.L.2013, c.114.
2013-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2013-05-30SenateMotion To Table (22-16) (Weinberg)
2013-05-30SenateMotion To Sa (Bateman)
2013-05-30SenateSubstituted for S2485 (2R)
2013-05-13SenateUSED FOR EXPIRATION DATE OF A LAW, OR SPECIAL MESSAGE SA Reverts Bill To Intro Version
2013-05-13SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Scutari)
2013-05-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-02-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2013-02-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (63-3-10)
2013-02-21AssemblyMotion To Table (47-30-0) (Greenwald)
2013-02-21AssemblyMotion To Aa (Kean)
2013-02-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2485 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3687 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback